Administration (Teaching)
Director, Coordinator and Nodal Officer of the Centres/Units
Directors, Coordinators and Nodal Officers of the Centres/Units
Updated on 21.03.2024
S.No.
Name
Designation
Department
Period
Office Memo No.
1
Prof. Sheelu Shafeeq,
Director
Rajiv Gandhi Centre for Diabetes & Endocrinology
18.01.24 to 17.01.27
O.M.No.238/T dated 17.01.2024
2
Dr. Hassan Imam
Director
AMU Centre, Kishanganj
15.10.19 to 14.10.23
O.M.No.2617/T dated 15.10.2022
3
Dr. Nigamananda Biswas
Officiating Director
AMU Centre Murshidabad
15.03.2021 till further order
O.M.No.731/T dated15.03.2021
O.M.No.2621/T dated18.10.2022
4
Dr. Faisal K.P
Officiating Director
AMU Centre Malappuram
20.04.19
till further order
O.M.No.1007/T dated 20.04.2019
5
Dr. Faiza Abbasi, Asstt. Professor
Officiating Director
UGC Human Resource & Development Centre
01.11.2021
till further order
O.M.No.2311/T dated 30.10.2021
6
Prof. Hina Younus
Coordinator
Interdisciplinary Biotechnology Unit
21.03.2024 to 20.03.2027
O.M.No.630/T dated 21.03.2024
7
Principal, University Polytechnic
Nodal Officer
Community College
24.05.19
till further order
O.M.No.1261/T dated 24.05.2019
8
Dr. Mohd. Azhar Aziz,
Director
Interdisciplinary Nanotechnology Centre
01.09.2021 to 31.08.2024
O.M.No.1663/T dated 01.09.2021
9
Prof. Iqbal Ali Khan
Coordinator
AMU Centres
08.05.2021 till further order
O.M.No.1182/T dated 08.05.2021
10
Prof. Mohamed Quamrul Hooda Faridi,
Director
Urdu Academy
23.07.2022 to 22.07.2025
O.M.No.1782/T dated 23.07.2022